JAMAICA BASIC SCHOOLS FOUNDATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal activity is to assist children attending basic schools in Jamaica by advancing the education of those children between 3 and 6 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Jamaica
Governance
- 19 August 1996: Standard registration
- JBSF(UK) (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shimeika Morgan | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kelly-Jade Bonitto | Trustee | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
EARL RATTRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPHINE WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.92k | £33.68k | £64.85k | £123.54k | £84.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.00k | £33.68k | £64.26k | £122.23k | £84.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 February 2025 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 February 2022 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 February 2022 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH AUGUST 1996 as amended on 28 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
The charity?s objects are:- (1) to relieve children attending basic schools in Jamaica and to advance the education of such children in particular by: (1) to promote the development of the basic school sector in Jamaica through the provision of facilities for the education at the schools; (2) to assist the training and development of teachers in this sector; (3) to generate and access the funding necessary to facilitate the objects. (2) for the public benefit, to provide relief and assistance to the black and ethnic minority communities of adults and families in Croydon and South East London who are in need, by reason of age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or discrimination, in particular but not exclusively by: (1) providing a food provision service for such persons which they could not otherwise afford through lack of means;(2) providing befriending and support to vulnerable people in need, and help to access other support services; (3) operating a division of the charity to provide specific services to facilitate the objects; (4) generating and accessing the funding necessary to facilitate the objects.
Area of benefit
JAMAICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jamaican High Commission
1-2 Prince Consort Road
LONDON
SW7 2BZ
- Phone:
- 02084061914
- Email:
- jbsfuk@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window