AMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AMEN raises money to support specifically Christian ministries,most of which are holistic in nature. All those supported work in their own countries and are personally known to the founder of AMEN or one of the AMEN Trustees. Currently we have partners in India, Nigeria, the Philippines, Romania and Serbia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- India
- Nigeria
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Romania
- Serbia
Governance
- 16 August 1996: Standard registration
- ACTION FOR MEETING EVANGELICAL NEEDS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS CHATFIELD | Chair |
|
||||||
Sharon Winnifred Chatfield | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Williams | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET DENISE WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.72k | £301.54k | £267.93k | £225.36k | £236.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.92k | £266.65k | £250.57k | £240.04k | £252.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22ND SEPTEMBER 1995
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION EITHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS 2. THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION 3. THE RELIEF OF THE AGED POOR SICK OR DISABLED
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
79 NORTH ROAD
DARTFORD
DA1 3ND
- Phone:
- 01322226148
- Email:
- janet@amentrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window