Financial history KERATOCONUS SELF-HELP AND SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1057629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.10k £19.96k £11.02k £14.38k £8.68k
Total expenditure £26.07k £5.61k £13.59k £17.06k £14.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A