KERATOCONUS SELF-HELP AND SUPPORT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1057629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of those persons, primarily in the United Kingdom, suffering from Keratoconus (conical cornea) in particular but not exclusively by the provision of advice, support and assistance to such persons.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £8,684
Total expenditure: £14,766

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • KERATOCONUS GROUP (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Gable Chair 15 March 2014
None on record
John Thatcher Trustee 18 March 2017
None on record
Julia Barby Trustee 18 March 2017
None on record
Michael Godfrey Oliver Trustee 15 March 2014
None on record
MR CHRIS LONGHORN Trustee 28 November 2012
None on record
ELAINE NICKOLAY Trustee
None on record
ANNE KLEPACZ Trustee
None on record
JOHN SMITH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £17.10k £19.96k £11.02k £14.38k £8.68k
Total expenditure £26.07k £5.61k £13.59k £17.06k £14.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 03 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 25 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 03 August 2020 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PO BOX 26251
LONDON
W3 9WQ
Phone:
02089934759