SOUTHAMPTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping older people to continue with life long learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Southampton City
Governance
- 19 August 1996: Standard registration
- SOUTHAMPTON U3A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alice Green | Chair | 20 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Hall | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Peter Giles | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael Brown | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA GORTON | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen McCaskie | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rowland | Trustee | 04 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Martin Cockroft | Trustee | 06 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.00k | £5.88k | £11.53k | £22.11k | £18.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.69k | £5.86k | £13.04k | £22.75k | £17.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 SEP 1992 AS AMENDED ON 26 JUN 1996 AS AMENDED ON 24 JAN 2001 AS AMENDED ON 02 FEB 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
SOUTHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Evelyn Crescent
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 5JE
- Phone:
- 0000000000
- Email:
- rick.cockroft@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window