Governing document CASTLETON BRASS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/07/1995 AS AMENDED ON 16/02/1996 AS AMENDED ON 08/01/2002 AS AMENDED ON 19/04/2006 AS AMENDED ON 26/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO MUSIC PRESENTED AND PERFORMED BY BRASS BANDS BY MEANS OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES TO WHICH MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC SHALL HAVE ACCESS. ALSO PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THOSE PERSONS WISHING TO FURTHER THEIR SKILLS ON PLAYING A BRASS INSTRUMENT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TUITION AND LOAN OF INSTRUMENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.