Financial history SAVILE TOWN MUSLIM PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1057660
Charity reporting is up to date (144 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £415.56k £345.17k £451.99k £483.48k £524.40k
Total expenditure £440.16k £367.38k £467.67k £520.95k £584.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.39k £110.11k £71.50k £52.49k £38.72k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £471.36k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £38.72k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.55k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.77k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £584.91k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0