CLEVELAND DISABILITY FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVICE AND INFROMATION, CONSULTANCY, DISABILITY EQUALITY TRAINING ACCESS AUDITS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 20 August 1996: Standard registration
- 03 January 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.36k | £37.29k | £12.71k | £16 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.64k | £35.80k | £12.70k | £1.51k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 15 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 11 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 30 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 31 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 DECEMBER 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17 JUNE 1996.
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AMONGST DISABLED PERSONS IN STOCKTON ON TEES, HARTLEPOOL, MIDDLESBROUGH, REDCAR AND CLEVELAND ('THE AREA') AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS AMONGST PERSONS IN THE AREA WHO MAY BE DISABLED ABOUT THE EFFECTS OF DISABILITY AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY ASSISTING IN RESEARCH, THE RESULTS OF WHICH SHALL BE DISSEMINATED BY APPROPRIATE BODIES.
Area of benefit
STOCKTON ON TEES, HARTLEPOOL, MIDDLESBROUGH, REDCAR AND CLEVELAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window