Accounts and annual returns SOUTHWICK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1057702
Charity reporting is up to date (165 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 April 2025 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 April 2025 165 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 14 April 2025 531 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 14 April 2025 531 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 November 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window