WORLD PENTECOST CHURCH

Charity number: 1057779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SUMMARY OF ACTIVITIES: ? Preaching the Gospel of Jesus Christ to the lost ? Prayer and counselling others ? Researching into organising charity international football matches to raise funds for world poor children vocational training

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,800
Total expenditure: £3,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 August 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • WORLD YOUTH COUNSELLING AND PRAYER (Working name)
  • WORLD YOUTH SPORTS (FOOTBALL) (Working name)
  • WORLD YOUTH VOCATIONAL TRAINING (Working name)
  • WORLD EVANGELISTIC MINISTRIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REVEREND JOHN AGYEI ACHEAMPONG Chair
None on record
SAMUEL OSAFO Trustee
VICTORY LIFE DELIVERANCE MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.85k £3.20k £3.50k £3.60k £3.80k
Total expenditure £4.85k £3.20k £3.50k £3.60k £3.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
47 SCOTLAND GREEN ROAD
ENFIELD
EN3 4RE
Phone:
02088051552
Website:

No information available