Financial history CHILDREN FIRST INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1057811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024 31/03/2025
Total gross income £7.17k £7.95k £17.63k £5.24k £8.13k
Total expenditure £12.19k £5.51k £20.60k £19.59k £9.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A