RAINBOW TRUST AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Livingstone, Zambia, R.T.A. provides high quality education for over 500 children, 33% of whom are sponsored, at King's Pre-School & Primary School; medical services from Mwenda Medical Centre to 5 remote locations on a twice weekly basis; assistance for destitute grannies & their orphaned grandchildren; food aid as required; and the establishment & support of village church communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- South Africa
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 02 September 1996: Standard registration
- RAINBOW AFRICA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ANDREW EAGLE | Chair |
|
||||||
TIMOTHY JOHN EAGLE | Trustee | 18 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Watts | Trustee | 09 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS RAYMOND BURTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £286.74k | £407.51k | £163.61k | £191.30k | £188.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £295.13k | £216.37k | £179.24k | £289.34k | £237.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH NOVEMBER 1995.
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.
Area of benefit
AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DE MONTFORT BUSINESS SERVICES
THE MANSE
22 DE MONTFORT STREET
LEICESTER
LE1 7GB
- Phone:
- 01162551811
- Email:
- admin@rainbowafrica.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window