CHIDDINGSTONE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of village hall facilities for the use of the inhabitants of the Parish of Chiddingstone in the County of Kent without distinction of political, religious or other opinions including use for meetings, lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving the conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £130 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 03 September 1996: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert N Golds | Chair | 23 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby Frederick Haysom | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Haysom | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sinclair | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Timothy French | Trustee | 17 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penny Harris | Trustee | 18 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Emily Florence Vicary | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE GOLDSMITH | Trustee | 10 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.21k | £19.47k | £12.09k | £10.70k | £10.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.48k | £5.67k | £27.46k | £10.48k | £12.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £130 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE MADE 29TH MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF CHIDDINGSTONE IN THE COUNTY OF KENT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHIDDINGSTONE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mill Barn
Mill Lane
Chiddingstone
EDENBRIDGE
Kent
TN8 7AA
- Phone:
- 01732457735
- Email:
- hilaryallen.brook@gmail.com
- Website:
-
chiddingstonevillagehall.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window