Accounts and annual returns JOHN SMITH TRUST

Charity number: 1057885
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2016 16 June 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 16 June 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2015 17 June 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 17 June 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 26 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 26 June 2015 On Time