THE MANCHESTER BUDDHA'S LIGHT SUNDAY CHINESE SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.Teaching Chinese (Mandarin class) for the 5-15 Years children 2.Teaching Chinese Tradition Dance 3. Art work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bolton
- Bury
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 09 September 1996: Standard registration
- MANCHESTER FO GUANG CHINESE SCHOOL (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev YU-JU LIN | Trustee | 10 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIU FUN LEE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW CHOY ON YU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.10k | £5.49k | £7.46k | £7.10k | £5.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.60k | £6.60k | £5.26k | £3.79k | £4.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 March 2021 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JULY 1996 AS AMENDED ON 16 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
(1) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS IN THE CHINESE AND ENGLISH LANGUAGES. (2) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PERSONS INTO THE HISTORY AND CULTURE OF CHINA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
540 STRETFORD ROAD
OLD TRAFFORD
MANCHESTER
M16 9AF
- Phone:
- 01618723338
- Email:
- fgcs.edu@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window