OPERA OMNIBUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Present fully staged operas. Enable talented emerging professional singers to gain performance experience at the start of their careers in operatic events. Increase access to high quality opera throughout the region and encourage community involvement. Introduce children, the elderly and disabled to the potential of opera and music theatre, by means of matinees and workshops.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 September 1996: Standard registration
- OPERA SOUTH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Austin | Chair | 16 December 2022 |
|
|||||
Paul Gerard Curievici | Trustee | 19 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Hurley | Trustee | 16 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.02k | £2.94k | £24.19k | £12.43k | £936 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.07k | £1.10k | £25.68k | £20.11k | £1.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 04 August 2024 | 96 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES PARTICULARLY THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC, OPERA AND OPERETTA
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Mill Close
HASLEMERE
Surrey
GU27 1SA
- Phone:
- 01428642321
- Email:
- opsouthproduction@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window