YOUNG DEVON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Young Devon provides the following services: Youth Enquiry & Counselling Services Housing Support Services Youth Inclusion & Volunteering Mentoring Young People in Care Advocacy Services for Young People between 15 & 17 with Special Needs Life Skills training Informing & training Young People in Participation strategies Training of Youth Workers and Volunteers Other Charitable Purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,919,437
Donations and legacies | £30.38k | |
Charitable activities | £4.88m | |
Other trading activities | £598 | |
Investments | £4.03k | |
Other | £2.02k |
Total expenditure:
£4,994,155
Raising funds | £200.96k | |
Charitable activities | £4.79m | |
Other | £229 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,877,697 from 32 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £201.19k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.79m |
People

146 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
99 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 10 September 1996: Standard registration
- DEVON YOUTH ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Flower | Chair | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Laws | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Brown | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Taylor Simmonds | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Megan Chapple | Trustee | 03 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Borg | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Bernadette Hannaford | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Vincent Coward | Trustee | 24 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Warren-Brown | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.29m | £4.34m | £4.45m | £5.25m | £4.92m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.16m | £3.98m | £4.36m | £5.16m | £4.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.74m | £2.63m | £2.69m | £3.53m | £3.88m | |
|
Income from government grants | £26.25k | £112.21k | £34.44k | £13.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £97.75k | £45.85k | £71.84k | £68.80k | £30.38k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £181.99k | £3.50k | £14.13k | £721 | £598 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.01m | £4.29m | £4.36m | £5.17m | £4.88m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £104 | £62 | £58 | £1.73k | £4.03k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.61k | £2.02k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.87m | £3.90m | £4.35m | £4.95m | £4.79m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £293.37k | £37.03k | £12.69k | £210.13k | £200.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £10.85k | £14.55k | £11.96k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £31 | £37.83k | £0 | £231 | £229 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £446.85k | £879.04k | £987.94k | £1.29m | £1.58m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £840.85k | £1.23m | £1.27m | £1.19m | £811.40k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £626.68k | £685.29k | £749.42k | £889.48k | £869.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED 2 MARCH 2006 AND 24 FEBRUARY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 SEPTEMBER 2013
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; VALUING AND RESPECTING RELATIONSHIPS WITH THEM THAT RECOGNISE THEIR RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES AND ACTIVELY PROMOTING EACH INDIVIDUAL'S DEVELOPMENT, CHOICE AND CHANGE. IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: 1) TO BRING TOGETHER PEOPLE WHO ARE WILLING TO FURTHER THE ABOVE OBJECTS, TO STIMULATE INTEREST IN ALL ASPECTS OF WORK WITH YOUNG PEOPLE. 2) TO WORK DIRECTLY WITH YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY THOSE WHO ARE VULNERABLE OR MARGINALIZED WITHIN THEIR OWN COMMUNITIES, PROVIDING SERVICES AND TRAINING WHICH ENHANCE THEIR PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT AND GENERAL WELLBEING. 3) TO UNITE AND SUPPORT THE WORK OF THOSE YOUTH ORGANISATIONS, CLUBS AND GROUPS IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL COUNTY OF DEVON, WHOSE PRIMARY PURPOSES ARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THOSE OF THE COMPANY. 4) TO DEVELOP TRAINING, VOLUNTEERING AND OTHER SERVICES WHICH INFORM AND SUPPORT OTHERS WHO WORK WITH YOUNG PEOPLE IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES. 5) TO CARRY OUT RESEARCH AND DEVELOP STRATEGIES IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHERS WHICH LEAD TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF GOOD YOUTH WORK PRACTICE.
Area of benefit
DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Young Devon
10 Erme Road
Ivybridge
PL21 0AB
- Phone:
- 01752691511
- Email:
- info@youngdevon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window