JAMIA ISLAMIA RIZWIA (ISLAMIC EDUCATION CENTRE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TEACHING ISLAMIC STUDIES FOR BOTH ADULTS AND CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 11 September 1996: Standard registration
- DARUL ULUOM JAMIA ISLAMIA RIZWIA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saira Siddiqui | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Saeeda Bi | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sayed Hamdani Maulana | Trustee | 08 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Aslam SIDDIQUI | Trustee | 15 April 1996 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ASLAM SIDDIQUI | Trustee | 15 April 1996 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.55k | £16.14k | £18.98k | £17.25k | £13.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.49k | £13.47k | £19.23k | £20.46k | £13.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 August 2024 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2023 | 228 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2022 | 320 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15 APRIL 1996, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 6 AUGUST 1996.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING RELIGIOUS EDUCATION. 2. TO ADVANCE RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH MUSLIM FAITH. 3. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY VISITING ILL PERSONS. 4. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
119 Southfield Lane
Bradford
BD5 9HQ
- Phone:
- 07861385685
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window