YORK SCHOOLS AND YOUTH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YoYo supports and serves primary and secondary schools to achieve relevant and effective communication of the Christian faith. In traditional and contemporary ways it seeks to offer York's children and young people opportunities to learn the values of Jesus Christ's teaching for their life. As a non-denominational trust we work collaborately with volunteers and youth workers from many churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 12 September 1996: Standard registration
- 21 March 2024: Funds received from 702092 THE GALTRES CHURCH TRUST
- Y O Y O (Working name)
- Y.O.Y.O (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lawrence Rab | Trustee | 27 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Deborah Blue BA Hons | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Smith | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Hale | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PETER FULLER | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Bryony Anne Beresford | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Dot Bevington | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE CLARE ROBERTS BED LTCL | Trustee | 29 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.75k | £126.09k | £204.73k | £178.06k | £211.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £156.14k | £178.82k | £179.78k | £191.13k | £208.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JULY 1996 as amended on 24 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN SCHOOLS AND YOUTH CLUBS AND TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN YORK OR THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
YORK AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holgate Methodist Church
Acomb Road
York
YO24 4AE
- Phone:
- 01904704760
- Email:
- office@yoyotrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window