The Moriah Legacy Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supports Moriah Jewish Day School in the London Borough of Harrow.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Harrow
Governance
- 12 September 1996: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF MORIAH (Previous name)
- HARROW JEWISH DAY SCHOOL TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP DAVID GERSHUNY | Chair | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GARY LEVY | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Doreen Samuels | Trustee | 16 May 2012 |
|
|||||
BRIAN IVAN LEAVER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANE LEAVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/08/2019 | 29/08/2020 | 29/08/2021 | 29/08/2022 | 29/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.76k | £68.03k | £2.36k | £240 | £32.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £574.41k | £115.13k | £3.53k | £14.70k | £47.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 August 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 August 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2019 | 15 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 19TH AUGUST 1996. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAY 2012 as amended on 29 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL) BY PROMOTING THE SCHOOL AND FURTHERING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL UNDER THE RELIGIOUS DIRECTION OF THE CHIEF RABBI AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS OF THE SCHOOL AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE NEVERTHELESS TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS OF ACADEMIC EXCELLENCE IN BOTH JEWISH AND SECULAR SUBJECTS AND PROMOTING JEWISH BELIEFS, VALUES AND TRADITIONS WHEREVER POSSIBLE, AND (B) TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH RELIGION, TO RELIEVE POVERTY OR FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR OTHERWISE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
PINNER, MIDDLESEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eastcote Point
Cuckoo Hill
PINNER
Middlesex
HA5 2BB
- Phone:
- 02088680981
- Email:
- paul@lawrencegrant.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window