Accounts and annual returns FAREHAM AND GOSPORT FAMILY AID

Charity Number: 1058014
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 03 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 06 March 2016 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 03 July 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 03 July 2014 On Time