KRISHNA YOGA MANDIR
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 September 1996: Standard registration
- 09 September 2012: Removed (Does not operate)
- K R S N A (KRISHNA) YOGA MANDIR (Working name)
- KRSNA YOGA MANDIR (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14 | £11 | £6 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £15 | £140 | £58 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 June 2011 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 23 February 2010 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 8 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE HINDU DHARMA AND THEREBY PROPAGATE RIGHTEOUSNESS BY PRAYER, HYMNS, DEVOTIONAL SONGS AND SCRIPTURAL READINGS; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HINDUISM THROUGH THE HINDI LANGUAGE; (3) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE HINDU CULTURE, VALUES, TRADITION AND WAY OF LIFE; AND (4) TO RELIEVE HINDU PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY, UNEMPLOYMENT, HOMELESSNESS OR BY OTHER REASONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window