CLEVELAND ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Institute of Advanced Motorists affiliated group promoting road safety by providing information and advice fostering advanced motorcycle riding skills in the North East of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- North Yorkshire
- Redcar And Cleveland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 16 September 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Elizabeth Atkinson | Chair | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Darren Turner | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Thornburn | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hodgson | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Grylls | Trustee | 27 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Markus Hammler | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £1.19k | £1.14k | £959 | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £575 | £765 | £1.29k | £1.72k | £1.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 OCTOBER 1995
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 CHURCH LANE
MIDDLETON ST. GEORGE
DARLINGTON
DL2 1DF
- Phone:
- 01325 332345
- Email:
- cambikers.iam@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window