DOSTIYO- ASIAN WOMEN AND GIRLS ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
-Advice and Information -Countywide Advocacy Service for Older People -Opportunities to volunteers and gain training within Dostiyo and through external agenices. -Various classes for the elderly and disabled Asian Communities. -Physical and Emotional Wellbeing Support -Befriending Scheme -Weekly Wellbeing cafe's -Community Fridge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 17 September 1996: Standard registration
- DOSTIYO- ASIAN WOMEN AND GIRLS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANJONA ROY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Farhat Lateef | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Saroj Padhiar | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Kalpana Maisuria | Trustee | 13 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PUSHPINDER BHAMBRA | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
HASUBEN SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VAUBEN DESAI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.27k | £220.71k | £147.45k | £143.09k | £138.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.61k | £163.56k | £157.57k | £146.71k | £161.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £91.08k | £83.71k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.17k | N/A | £3.87k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 4TH APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
[1] TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ASIAN WOMEN AND GIRLS, IN OR NEAR THE BOROUGH OF NORTHAMPTON (HEREIN CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF ENGLISH AND MOTHER TONGUE CLASSES.[2] TO PROVIDE ADVICE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH. [3] TO RELIEVE PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ELDERLY ASIANS LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF A LUNCHEON CLUB AND BY PROVIDING SUCH OTHER RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AS IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
IN OR NEAR BOROUGH OF NORTHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
62-66 DUNSTER STREET
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 3JY
- Phone:
- 01604816080
- Email:
- info@dostiyo.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window