Financial history CALCUTT AND FOREST MOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1058095
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £16.54k £13.71k £28.96k £24.84k £27.48k
Total expenditure £17.74k £13.47k £16.45k £16.47k £22.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.43k £12.26k N/A £0