Trustees CALCUTT AND FOREST MOOR VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 1058095

Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Allen Royston | Chair | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Courtney | Trustee | 09 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Mary Powell | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Elizabeth Bryant | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Dodds | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Carter | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Ashworth | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jill Coote | Trustee | 17 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
COLIN BROADBANK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.