Financial history FOUR TWELVE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1058105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £35.83k £25.19k £3.76k £6.84k £3.71k
Total expenditure £3.81k £51.33k £2.81k £7.57k £3.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A