Financial history VULCAN RESTORATION TRUST

Charity number: 1058111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £113.88k £118.77k £139.17k £172.70k £177.46k
Total expenditure £80.11k £42.85k £113.30k £169.05k £180.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £20.78k N/A £4.29k