VULCAN RESTORATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preservation of Avro Vulcan aircraft as part of Britain's aviation heritage, in particular Avro Vulcan B2 XL426 at London Southend Airport, Essex, and to educate the general public in matters relating to the Vulcan's role in Britain's military history.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £4,287 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Essex
Governance
- 18 September 1996: Standard registration
- VRT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH ELIZABETH DUERDEN | Trustee | 19 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN JOHN WHITTLE | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Keene | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GRAHAM FATHERS | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER RAINEY | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MATT LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN CLARKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.88k | £118.77k | £139.17k | £172.70k | £177.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.11k | £42.85k | £113.30k | £169.05k | £180.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £20.78k | N/A | £4.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 24TH MAY 1996.
Charitable objects
(1) TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT AVRO VULCAN AIRCRAFT AND OTHER AIRCRAFT WHICH MAY OR HAVE BEEN IN THE PAST ASSOCIATED WITH THE AVRO VULCAN AS HISTORICAL OBJECTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND TO DEMONSTRATE AND DISPLAY SUCH AIRCRAFT AT PUBLIC EVENTS. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ITEMS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST TOGETHER WITH THE ASSOCIATION EQUIPMENT THERETO IN PARTICULAR IN THE FIELD OF AVIATION.
Area of benefit
SOUTHEND/ROCHFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
HANGAR 5 SOUTH ROAD
LONDON SOUTHEND AIRPORT
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
ESSEX
SS2 6YU
- Phone:
- 02083091161
- Email:
- info@avrovulcan.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window