Trustees VULCAN RESTORATION TRUST
Charity number: 1058111

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HANNAH ELIZABETH DUERDEN | Trustee | 19 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN JOHN WHITTLE | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Keene | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN WAGSTAFF | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GRAHAM FATHERS | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER RAINEY | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
MATT LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN CLARKSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.