DRAKE'S TRUE MOVEMENTS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 September 1996: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- DTMT (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH FOR THE EDUCATION AND BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE TRUE MOVEMENTS OF SIR FRANCIS DRAKE ALONG THE WEST COAST OF NORTH AMERICA IN THE YEAR 1579. AS PART OF THIS, TO DETERMINE WHETHER DRAKE HAD DISCOVERED WESTERN CANADA, TWO CENTURIES BEFORE JAMES COOK, AND TO LOCATE THE SITE WHERE DRAKE SPENT THAT SUMMER AND ESTABLISH THE FIRST OUTPOST OF THE BRITISH EMPIRE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window