THE OLD MEETING HOUSE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OPERATION OF HELMSLEY ARTS CENTRE. PROVISION OF ARTS EVENTS AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,945 from 2 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 September 1996: Standard registration
- HELMSLEY ARTS CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Lee Vernon | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Angela Gilbert | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Nicholas Anthony Stuart Andrews | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rhys Lewis Jones | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Gill Garbutt | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Jean Sheridan | Trustee | 22 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Christopher Belsom | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
THE HON JAKE DUNCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
MARTIN VANDER WEYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
Stephen Arnold | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
JOHN RICHARD LANE LLB AKC | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £294.22k | £204.01k | £262.61k | £268.37k | £305.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.69k | £170.44k | £277.58k | £322.41k | £328.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.42k | £11.12k | £697 | £6.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 MAY 1996
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER PROMOTE AND TO INCREASE AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF ART,MUSIC AND LITERATURE AND FOR THOSE PURPOSES TO PROMOTE AND TO ORGANISE ART EXHIBITIONS,MUSIC RECITALS AND CONCERTS POETRY RECITALS AND READINGS,LECTURES AND FILMS AND UPON ARTISTIC MUSICAL AND LITERARY SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE HELMSLEY/RYEDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Helmsley Arts Centre
1 Meeting House Court
Helmsley
York
YO62 5DW
- Phone:
- 01439 771715
- Email:
- helmsleyarts@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window