THE ELKHAVEN CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 September 1996: Standard registration
- 09 January 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- ELKHAVEN CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2004 | 30/06/2005 | 30/06/2006 | 30/06/2007 | 30/06/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.38k | £8.09k | £10.29k | £2.12k | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.49k | £16.45k | £14.58k | £9.54k | £8.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 23 September 2009 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 23 September 2009 | 511 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 10 March 2009 | 680 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 10 March 2009 | 680 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 JUNE 1996 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 16 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
TO APPLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window