TONNAU PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Simple fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 19 September 1996: Standard registration
- TONNA PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- TONNAU PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA (Working name)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Evans | Chair | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
LLOYD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/12/2019 | 19/12/2020 | 19/12/2021 | 19/12/2022 | 19/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.84k | £570 | £0 | £1.40k | £2.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £600 | £0 | £850 | £799 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2022 | 08 August 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
SCHOOL ROAD
TONNA
NEATH
SA11 3EJ
- Phone:
- 01639637062
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window