Accounts and annual returns JUGNU BHANGRA GROUP

Charity number: 1058160
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2007 23 July 2008 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 October 2008 271 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 24 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 07 June 2006 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 09 May 2006 98 days late