CHRISTIAN BLIND MISSION (UNITED KINGDOM) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CBM UK transforms the lives of people with disabilities, their families and communities in the poorest places in the world. We work with local partners to prevent and cure diseases that cause disability and build a world where people with disabilities can fulfil their potential, helping them access healthcare and education, build sustainable livelihoods and play an active role in their community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£7,059,181
Donations and legacies | £4.59m | |
Charitable activities | £2.03m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £426.67k | |
Other | £12.33k |
Total expenditure:
£6,806,212
Raising funds | £1.69m | |
Charitable activities | £5.06m | |
Other | £61.91k |
£81,084 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,001,303 from 100130 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.75m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.06m | |
Retained for future use | £252.97k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.75m | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.06m | |
Retained for future use | £334.05k |
People

38 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bangladesh
- Germany
- Indonesia
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Rwanda
- Scotland
- Tanzania
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 19 September 1996: Standard registration
- 19 May 2022: Funds received from 1079599 BASICNEEDS
- C B M (Working name)
- CBM (UK) (Working name)
- CHRISTIAN BLIND MISSION (Working name)
- END THE CYCLE OF POVERTY & DISABILITY (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jim Ackers | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ifufnun Akerejola Akinduro | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amjad Ali | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fingani M'Hone | Trustee | 26 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Morris | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antonio Roberto Paolo Massella | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham Gordon | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Waithaka | Trustee | 16 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Victor Robson | Trustee | 11 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Fiona Celia Rowe | Trustee | 11 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dillarstone | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Dun | Trustee | 22 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.73m | £8.98m | £13.48m | £6.14m | £7.06m | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.49m | £9.43m | £11.42m | £6.30m | £6.81m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.41m | £3.03m | £3.33m | £1.48m | £1.00m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £8.67m | £8.91m | £8.58m | £4.06m | £4.59m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £4.60m | £1.88m | £2.03m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £28.15k | £14.10k | £41.57k | £184.51k | £426.67k | |
|
Income - Other | £28.67k | £57.49k | £252.35k | £10.52k | £12.33k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £674.21k | £996.71k | £3.40m | £1.08m | £1.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £6.99m | £8.03m | £9.30m | £4.62m | £5.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.51m | £1.40m | £2.12m | £1.68m | £1.69m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.54k | £28.67k | £25.88k | £0 | £32.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £8.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £61.91k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.06m | £321.90k | £1.73m | £191.30k | £118.26k | |
|
Long-term investments | £23.87k | £1.47m | £1.14m | £5.98m | £7.56m | |
|
Other assets | £7.26m | £6.86m | £7.68m | £4.07m | £2.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £208.41k | £495.63k | £242.86k | £272.37k | £240.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 06 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 23 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 23 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JANUARY 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 27 AUGUST 1996 & 27 OCTOBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08 MAR 2018 as amended on 17 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 (A) TO PROVIDE FOR THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITIES OF ALL KINDS, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO BLINDNESS AND VISUAL IMPAIRMENT, AND INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PREVENTATIVE TREATMENT, OR THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND TECHNOLOGICAL AIDS FOR BLIND, PARTIALLY SIGHTED AND OTHER DISABLED PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR IN COUNTRIES OF THE DEVELOPING WORLD; AND (B) TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES, OR AT RISK OF DISABILITY, AND THEIR FAMILIES, AND FOR THOSE CARING FOR, EMPLOYING, ASSISTING OR OTHERWISE HAVING DEALINGS WITH SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR IN COUNTRIES OF THE DEVELOPING WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Blind Mission (UK) Ltd
1 Munro House
Munro Court
20 Mercers Row
CAMBRIDGE
- Phone:
- 01223484731
- Email:
- info@cbmuk.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window