ONNELEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Community Hall for local residents of Onneley to meet and socialise. Also rent out building to other people and organisations for community activities, meetings, parties and/or functions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 20 September 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolyn Ann Finnemore | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernard George Finnemore | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Simon Baines | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Margaret Hopkins | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Graham Frederick Musto | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA JEAN MUSTO | Trustee | 16 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.57k | £18.99k | £8.42k | £13.51k | £20.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.24k | £10.41k | £3.10k | £7.31k | £41.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £3.17k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 04 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 1967.
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE THAT THE INHABITANTS AT LARGE OF THE VILLAGE OF ONNELEY SHALL FOREVER HAVE A COMMUNAL CENTRE AND MISSION CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE VILLAGE OF ONNELEY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Graceland
Station Road
Onneley
CREWE
CW3 9QQ
- Phone:
- 07528108317
- Email:
- linda.graceland@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window