HOSPITAL RADIO SWALE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of the benefits of living a healthy lifestyle, and the importance of maintaining good personal mental and physical health.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 20 September 1996: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Wilkinson | Chair | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MARK PARKER | Trustee | 03 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brown | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147 | £4.00k | £45 | £2.72k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.04k | £145 | £367 | £3.21k | £1.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 December 2024 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1974 (AS AMENDED ON 11TH SEPTEMBER 1996)
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO AID IN THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, INFIRMITY AND OLD AGE AMONGST PERSON LIVING IN THE BOROUGH OF SWALE AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY PROVIDING A LOCAL BROADCASTING SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, OLD PERSONS HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS .
Area of benefit
SWALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sheppy Community Hospital
Plover Road
Minster on Sea
Sheerness
ME12 3LT
- Phone:
- 07857140300
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window