THE WELSH KITE TRUST/YMDDIRIEDOLAETH BARCUDIAID CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The monitoring of the Red Kite population in Wales including the organisation of watchers who carry out the field work involved in locating the pairs of nesting Red Kites in the breeding season, arranging to ring and tag the young in each nest and producing a breeding report showing the the total breeding pairs and the number of young Red Kites fledged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 September 1996: Standard registration
- THE WELSH KITE TRUST (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Cross | Chair | 05 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
PADDY JENKS | Trustee | 06 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
LEO NEIL SMITH | Trustee | 26 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.08k | £6.88k | £4.58k | £4.18k | £5.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67k | £9.67k | £2.44k | £1.69k | £2.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 October 2024 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF BIRDS OF PREY AND IN PARTICULAR THE WELSH RED KITE AND TO UNDERTAKE ANY ACTIVITY INCLUDING RESEARCH WHICH WILL ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION REGARDING SUCH BIRDS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SAMARIA
NANTMEL
LLANDRINDOD WELLS
POWYS
LD1 6EN
- Phone:
- 07837521673
- Email:
- tony.cross@virgin.net
- Website:
-
welshkitetrust.wales
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window