Accounts and annual returns BRITISH DEAF HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1058230
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 18 April 2006 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 25 April 2006 84 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 26 April 2006 450 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 26 April 2006 450 days late