Newcare Housing Society

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE SUPPORT OF PERSONS WHO REQUIRE SPECIAL CARE, EDUCATION OR TRAINING. TO MAINTAIN HOUSING, HOMES, SCHOOLS ETC AND PROVIDE PRACTICAL HELP WITH LODGINGS, BOARD, MEDICAL ATTENTION AND OTHER NECESSARY COMFORTS. TO ACTIVELY RAISE FUNDS THROUGH STATUTORY, COMMERCIAL AND INDEPENDENT CHANNELS AND VIA GENERAL FUNDRAISING ACTIVITIES AIMED AT THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £259,184 from 1 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 25 September 1996: Standard registration
- NEWCARE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- NEWCARE HOUSING SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN EDWARD COLEMAN BSC, PHD | Chair |
|
||||||
Jennifer Price | Trustee | 20 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Vaughan James | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Price | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE CHRISTINE HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £148.11k | £123.69k | £106.26k | £91.10k | £259.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £170.57k | £228.00k | £102.47k | £93.22k | £279.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £148.11k | £123.69k | £106.26k | £91.10k | £259.18k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21/05/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/09/1996 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/07/2012 as amended on 28 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE HOMELESS, WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS OR HAVE PHYSICAL OR LEARNING DISABILITIES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION. 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Court Street
UPTON-UPON-SEVERN
Worcestershire
WR8 0JS
- Phone:
- 07710929004
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window