SUSSEX VOICEWORKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve and develop public education and appreciation of the art and science of music in all its aspects by the presentation of workshops and public concerts & recitals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 September 1996: Standard registration
- PORTSLADE COMMUNITY COLLEGE CHOIR (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helen Prance | Chair | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Still | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANNE HALLIFAX | Trustee | 18 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.97k | £19.42k | £2.01k | £14.89k | £16.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.05k | £15.24k | £19.70k | £19.97k | £18.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 06 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 March 2021 | 291 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS; AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 Greenacres
Preston Park Avenue
BRIGHTON
BN1 6HR
- Phone:
- 01273556555
- Email:
- ANNEH@HALLIFAXCARE.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window