EMPOWER GLOBAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empower Global works as Family Church - Empowering communities through local church congregations. Empower Global supports relief work and missionary organisations overseas. The work of Family Church in our local communities aims to relieve poverty and support the peope local to us through initiatives, ongoing projects and community engagement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,642,094
Donations and legacies | £1.61m | |
Charitable activities | £11.17k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £16.33k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,467,478
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.47m | |
Other | £0 |
£14,059 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £94,704 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.47m | |
Retained for future use | £174.62k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.47m | |
Retained for future use | £188.68k |
People

24 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
450 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Angola
- Brazil
- Ecuador
- India
- Moldova
- Papua New Guinea
- Philippines
- Zambia
Governance
- FAMILY CHURCH (Working name)
- GOSPORT FAMILY CHURCH (Working name)
- PORTSMOUTH FAMILY CHURCH (Working name)
- HEARTS ON FIRE FOR JESUS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAYNE MARTIN KEEPING | Chair | 05 June 1996 |
|
|
||||
Elisa McIntyre | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Steyn | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Sutherland | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sotonye Dokubo | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ferguson | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mark Donald Charles Ward | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43m | £1.26m | £1.08m | £1.49m | £1.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.19m | £1.08m | £1.20m | £1.46m | £1.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.90k | £39.71k | £54.76k | £111.97k | £94.70k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.25m | £1.23m | £1.07m | £1.47m | £1.61m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £15.34k | £7.99k | £12.66k | £12.63k | £11.17k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £330 | £232 | £348 | £1.33k | £16.33k | |
|
Income - Other | £164.45k | £24.95k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.19m | £1.08m | £1.20m | £1.46m | £1.47m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.03k | £5.82k | £5.84k | £8.09k | £10.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £43.03k | £41.32k | £37.72k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £677.25k | £670.35k | £638.75k | £638.30k | £662.67k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £733.23k | £900.54k | £808.16k | £820.60k | £744.27k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £405.55k | £378.63k | £371.26k | £354.93k | £128.36k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/05/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/03/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15/05/2012 as amended on 25 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD. (II) THE PROMOTION OF THE WORSHIP OF GOD BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER, INCLUDING THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL; THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES; AND THE PRINTING, PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF CHRISTIAN LITERATURE, MEDIA PRODUCTS AND OTHER RESOURCES. (III) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF FINANCIAL NEED, OR OF THOSE PERSONS WHO ARE INFIRM FOR REASONS OF OLD AGE OR SICKNESS. (IV) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, MATERIALS AND BURSARIES FOR THE GENERAL EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OR ADULTS ON THE BASIS OF SUCH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Empower Global
83-87 Kingston Road
Portsmouth
Hampshire
PO2 7DX
- Phone:
- 0300 302 0090
- Email:
- mail@family.church
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window