Financial history SPA (PEGGY DODD) BATH

Charity number: 1058294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £547.68k £611.64k £669.01k £811.23k £928.59k
Total expenditure £539.64k £485.24k £596.23k £754.80k £725.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £229.60k £235.87k
Income from government grants £97.01k N/A £164.73k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £21.63k £186.93k £180.27k £138.77k £383.20k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £4.21k £5.47k £7.45k
Income - Charitable activities £506.03k £249.58k £429.93k £654.11k £514.54k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £118.38k £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.04k £7.34k £8.25k £12.88k £23.40k
Income - Other £9.98k £167.79k £164.73k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £18.92k £85.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £539.64k £485.19k £595.90k £754.35k £725.46k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £54 £326 £448 £0
Expenditure - Governance £2.83k £0 £5.84k £4.58k £9.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0