CLC INTERNATIONAL OFFICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sourcing, channeling and oversight of funds to CLC ministries worldwide. Investigation worldwide of new ministry opportunities. Distribution of news and information to related agencies. Training courses and consultancy arranged as appropriate. Provision of website and digital services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Barbados
- Benin
- Bolivia
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Canada
- Chile
- Colombia
- Cyprus
- Dominica
- Ecuador
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Mexico
- Mozambique
- Netherlands
- Pakistan
- Panama
- Philippines
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Scotland
- Sierra Leone
- South Korea
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- Trinidad And Tobago
- United States
- Uruguay
Governance
- 27 September 1996: Standard registration
- 15 July 2021: Funds received from 1038747 BARNABAS EVANGELICAL LITERATURE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerald James Sidery | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Petra Nemansky | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Michael Watkins | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
JONATHAN BURTENSHAW CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee | 16 April 2015 |
|
|||||||
JOHN HAROLD RABY | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
|||||||
GRAHAM WILLIAM INCE | Trustee | 05 September 2008 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £565.59k | £403.54k | £472.14k | £528.84k | £430.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £586.61k | £385.06k | £398.85k | £517.58k | £406.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £370.12k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £193.69k | N/A | N/A | £507.91k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.78k | N/A | N/A | £705 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £20.22k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £586.61k | N/A | N/A | £517.58k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £9.04k | N/A | N/A | £10.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £376.22k | N/A | N/A | £302.75k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8 AUGUST 1996
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
118 Prospect Road
SHEFFIELD
S17 4JE
- Phone:
- 01142812135
- Email:
- office@clcinternational.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window