KEREN SHMUEL

Charity number: 1058334
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days

Charity overview

Regulatory alerts

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to organisations (including schools, charities etc)

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Belgium
  • Canada
  • France
  • Israel
  • Poland
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 September 1996: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Meir Yerachmeil Glaser Trustee 02 April 2025
None on record
ESTHER GLAZER Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
AVRAHAM ABA SILBERBERG Trustee 22 November 2023
ZLOTCHIV
Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days
KEREN CHOCHMAS SHLOMA TRUST
Charity reporting is overdue by 546 days

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £647.38k £847.04k £987.55k £731.79k £531.24k
Total expenditure £731.52k £853.79k £1.00m £723.93k £497.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £646.95k £846.06k £986.61k £731.61k £531.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £429 £980 £945 £179 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £31
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £729.63k £1.68k £995.87k £716.93k £495.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £852.10k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £729.63k £0 £0 £0 £495.33k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.89k £0 £5.49k £6.99k £2.30k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Own use assets £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £149.77k £143.02k £128.71k £137.27k £171.99k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £500 £500 £0 £700 £1.80k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 February 2023 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 February 2023 109 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 November 2020 18 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
25 CADOXTON AVENUE
LONDON
N15 6LB
Phone:
02088002628