Financial history BISHOP'S CLEEVE SENIORS CLUB

Charity number: 1058337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £66.39k £19.06k £6.37k £15.95k £52.28k
Total expenditure £57.53k £42.59k £7.27k £17.38k £49.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £539 N/A N/A N/A N/A