Financial history THE UK FEDERATION OF SMALLER MENTAL HEALTH AGENCIES

Charity number: 1058342
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £370 £165 £80 £44 £18
Total expenditure £237 £240 £74 £91 £89
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A