WEST MIDLANDS AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1058359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of staff and patient welfare facilities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £74,000
Total expenditure: £122,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Dudley
  • Herefordshire
  • Sandwell
  • Shropshire
  • Solihull
  • Telford & Wrekin
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 September 1997: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sukhjeeven Singh Nat Trustee 05 November 2024
None on record
Suzanne Banks Trustee 01 April 2024
None on record
Carla Beechey Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Caron Eyre Trustee 21 August 2023
None on record
Nathan Hudson Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Dr Richard Steyn Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Karen Rutter Trustee 01 May 2023
None on record
Professor Alexandra Hopkins Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Julie Jasper Trustee 13 October 2022
None on record
Mohammed Fessal Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Professor Ian Cumming Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
Mushtaq Ahmed Khan Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
West Midlands Ambulance Service Trustee 01 May 2013
None on record
ANTHONY MARSH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £145.00k £217.00k £548.15k £234.00k £74.00k
Total expenditure £138.00k £116.00k £502.73k £618.00k £122.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £547.82k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £328 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £502.73k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.74k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME SEALED 5 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING SICKNESS BY THE OPERATION OF A HELICOPTER EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICE WITHIN THE WEST MIDLANDS, SHROPSHIRE, STAFFORDSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE, HEREFORD AND WORCESTER, GLOUCESTERSHIRE, POWYS AND SUCH ADJACENT AREAS AS MAY BE EFFECTIVELY SERVED BY THE OPERATION OF ONE OR MORE HELICOPTER AMBULANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 12 September 1997 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
West Midlands Ambulance Service NHS
Trust
Unit 9
Waterfront Business Park
Dudley Road
BRIERLEY
Phone:
01384475031
Website:

No information available