NEW MILLS MARPLE AND DISTRICT ROUND TABLE NUMBER 554
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Throughout England
Governance
- 30 September 1996: Standard registration
- 08 December 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN NEW MILLS,MARPLE AND DISTRICT (INCLUDES SURROUNDING AREA) OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB IN CLUB IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NEW MILLS MARPLE AND SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window